FL S0990 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 563 (Ch. 2019-80)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 563 (Ch. 2019-80)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting certain victims of domestic violence from being disqualified for benefits for voluntarily leaving work; adding a circumstance under which the employment record of an employing unit may not be charged, etc.
Title
Unemployment Compensation
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 563 (Ch. 2019-80) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 563 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/17/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/08/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H563 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-80
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
443 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
443 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |