FL S0988 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-34
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Citing this act as the "No Patient Left Alone Act"; requiring certain providers to establish visitation policies and procedures within a specified timeframe; authorizing the resident, client, or patient to designate an essential caregiver; requiring in-person visitation in certain circumstances; authorizing providers to suspend in-person visitation of specific visitors under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
In-person Visitation
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Ileana Garcia [R] | Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
Sen. Ana Rodriguez [R] | Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#850 (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#4 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Chapter No. 2022-34 | |
2022-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 2 |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-08 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-07 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022) |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-03-04 | House | In Messages |
2022-03-04 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (826924) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/02/22, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H987 (Similar To) 2022-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 988
S1724 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
S1724 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy