FL S0988 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a state agency to enter into a pay-for-success contract with a private entity under certain conditions, subject to an appropriation and specified language in the General Appropriations Act; authorizing cancellation of the contract under specified circumstances; prohibiting a private entity from viewing or receiving personal client information that is otherwise confidential and exempt from public records requirements, etc.
Title
Pay-for-success Contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/988 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/988/BillText/Filed/HTML |