FL S0988 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-28 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 755
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing an exemption from public records requirements for information obtained by persons or agencies from the First Responder Network Authority and information relating to the Nationwide Public Safety Broadband Network obtained by persons or agencies from entities operating pursuant to a contract with the First Responder Network Authority; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.
Title
Public Records/ First Responder Network Authority/Nationwide Public Safety Broadband Network
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 755 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 755 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/28/18 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2017-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H755 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-60
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/988 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/988/BillText/Filed/HTML |