FL S0988 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Fiscal Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring an applicant for a driver license, driver license renewal, or identification card to provide a statement of whether he or she agrees to have his or her name included in the donor registry; specifying the options that may be selected by an applicant in his or her statement, etc.
Title
Anatomical Gifts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Now in Fiscal Policy |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 1 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Transportation read 1st time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | CS by Transportation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0809 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Highway and Waterway Safety Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 0041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 511 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 512 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 51551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
765 | 521 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |