FL S0984 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the voting membership of a metropolitan planning organization (M.P.O.) that is designated before a specified date to consist of a certain number of apportioned members, subject to certain requirements; requiring the voting membership of an M.P.O. designated on or after a specified date as a result of a combination or merger of previously separate M.P.O.'s to consist of a certain number of members, subject to certain requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metropolitan Planning Organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-11-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H575 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H807 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
S1516 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback