FL S0980 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain public transit providers to post a specified sign concerning the penalty for committing a battery upon a transit worker by a specified date; requiring public transit providers to create and implement a risk reduction program by a specified date; authorizing programs to include the deployment of battery mitigation infrastructure and technology on public transit vehicles; including assault or battery on a public transit employee or agent within specified reclassified offenses, etc.
Title
Battery upon Public Transit Workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Criminal Justice (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2021-03-10 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/02/21, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
341 | 0611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
784 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |