FL S0980 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising minimum requirements for actuarial reports for retirement systems or plans subject to part VII of ch. 112, F.S.; requiring the governing body responsible for the retirement system or plan to review the enrolled actuary's statement within a specified timeframe; requiring the unfunded liability of retirement systems or plans established on or after a certain date to be amortized within a specified timeframe, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Publicly Funded Retirement Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations
2017-11-21SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1363 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Administration Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11264Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112664Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112665Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1210312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1214501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
212055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback