FL S0974 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to authorize the Legislature, by general law, to exempt certain permanently installed standby generators from the tangible personal property tax and prohibit the consideration of such generators in determining the assessed value of real property, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permanently Installed Standby Generators/Exemption from Certain Taxation and Assessment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2017-11-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S976 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback