FL S0970 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the arrest, charging, prosecution, or penalizing under specified provisions of a person acting in good faith who seeks medical assistance for an individual experiencing, or believed to be experiencing, an alcohol or a drug-related overdose; prohibiting a person from being penalized for a violation of a condition of certain programs if that person in good faith seeks medical assistance for himself or herself or for an individual experiencing, or believed to be experiencing, an alcohol or a drug-related overdose, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcohol and Drug-related Overdoses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied on Calendar
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-15SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-30SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-26SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1261 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
89321Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback