FL S0968 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Specifying that certain interests received by a transferee after a divorce are exempt from claims of creditors upon being awarded to or received by the transferee; specifying that such interests remain exempt, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual Retirement Accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-24SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2022-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2022-01-12SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/12/22, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-11-30SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2021-11-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H649 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - 1st Reading (Original Filed Version)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22221Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback