FL S0968 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a district school board participating in the Mastery-Based Education Pilot Program to award credit based on student mastery of certain content and skills; renaming the Competency-Based Education Pilot Program as the Mastery-Based Education Pilot Program; requiring the statewide articulation agreement to ensure fair and equitable access for students with mastery-based, nontraditional diplomas and transcripts, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mastery-based Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/20/18, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations
2017-11-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1035 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
S732 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1003436Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10034996Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100723Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback