FL S0966 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the Next Generation Sunshine State Standards; providing that such standards are the minimum baseline core content standards for K-12 public schools; revising the requirements for instructional materials that a district school superintendent annually certifies, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Educational Standards for K-12 Public Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Education
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations; Rules
2017-11-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H825 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1006283Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback