FL S0964 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "marksense ballots" for purposes of the Florida Election Code; providing applicability of specified ballot requirements to a voter interface device, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voting Systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-23SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-21SenateCS/CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
2018-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-20SenateCS/CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-02-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/20/18, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-08SenateNow in Ethics and Elections
2018-02-08SenateRemaining references corrected to Ethics and Elections; Rules
2018-02-07SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-06SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-06SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/06/18, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-10SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-01-10SenateFavorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/10/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-11-17SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H709 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101151Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1015603Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10156075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1015614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
102166Amended CodeSee Bill Text
97021Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback