FL S0960 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a driver from continuously operating a motor vehicle in the furthermost left-hand lane of certain roadways, except under certain circumstances; providing applicability; providing a penalty, etc.
Title
Driving in the Furthermost Left-hand Lane of a Roadway
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Died in Transportation |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H647 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Died in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/960 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/960/BillText/Filed/HTML |