FL S0960 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Substance Abuse Services Modernization Act of 2019"; requiring, rather than authorizing, a clerk of the court to disclose certain records; removing provisions authorizing a law enforcement officer to detain a person in certain facilities under certain circumstances; providing duties of the court and the clerk of the court relating to the issuance of a writ of bodily attachment, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marchman Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations
2019-02-12SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H313 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976758Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976760Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976772Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976799Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397681Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397693Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397695Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976951Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976957Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397697Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3976975Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback