FL S0952 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as "Ponce's Law"; authorizing a court to prohibit certain offenders from owning or having contact with animals, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cruelty to Animals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-14SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H473 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1576 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-87

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82812Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback