FL S0948 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an honorary designation of a certain transportation facility in a specified county, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tera Ross Memorial Interchange

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Transportation
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2017-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H849 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Government Accountability Committee
H171 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 382
S382 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Chapter No. 2018-161

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback