FL S0944 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a specified annual appropriation to the Florida Forever Trust Fund; prohibiting moneys from the Land Acquisition Trust Fund from being used for specified costs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land Acquisition Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/12/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1341 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
375041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback