FL S0944 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a law enforcement officer with jurisdiction to place a specified written hold order on specified goods, etc.
Title
Secondhand Dealers
Sponsors
Sen. Darren Soto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/09/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/30/15, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Now in Criminal Justice |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/23/15, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Criminal Justice; Rules |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1047 (Same As) 2015-04-28 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/944 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/0944/BillText/Filed/HTML |