FL S0940 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HM 147
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to apply law and policy in Puerto Rico without discrimination or inequality and to incorporate the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico into the United States, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Puerto Rico

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-08SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HM 147
2018-03-08SenateSubstituted CS/HM 147
2018-03-08SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/18
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-07SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-31SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-30SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-01-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/30/18, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H147 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Signed by Officers and filed with Secretary of State

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback