FL S0934 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-11 - Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Pending: Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public records requirements for individual identifying information contained in certain homelessness counts and information systems; providing for retroactive application of the exemption; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Homelessness Counts and Information Systems

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Children, Families, and Elder Affairs (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2022-01-11SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/11/22, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-11-30SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2021-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H699 (Similar To) 2022-01-18 - Now in Government Operations Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4206231Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback