FL S0934 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements for a high-performing charter school; revising the facility capacity measurement used when a high-performing charter school increases its student enrollment; revising the number of charter schools that a high-performing charter school may establish in any year from two to one, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

High-performing Charter Schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-26SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2019-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-19SenateCS by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 2
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 03/19/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-02-11SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1002331Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback