FL S0934 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-17 - Chapter No. 2013-176
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that rules for environmental resource permitting provide for conceptual permits and associated general permits for a municipality or county that creates a stormwater management master plan for urban infill and redevelopment areas or community redevelopment areas; specifying requirements for a conceptual permit, etc.
Title
Stormwater Management Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#336 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-17 | Chapter No. 2013-176 | |
2013-06-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-06-10 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2013-04-30 | House | CS passed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-29 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Substituted for CS/HB 183 |
2013-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-26 | House | Received |
2013-04-26 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/13 |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2013-04-16 | House | In Messages |
2013-04-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/10/13 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/02/13, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2013-03-25 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation read 1st time |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | CS by Environmental Preservation and Conservation; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environmental Preservation and Conservation, 03/21/13, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0183 (Similar To) 2013-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 934 (Ch. 2013-176)