FL S0926 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Chapter No. 2022-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising licensure examination requirements for dentists to require applicants to demonstrate certain clinical skills on a manikin rather than a live patient; revising requirements for regional licensure examinations offered by dental schools to dental students; revising licensure examination requirements for dental hygienists to require applicants to demonstrate certain clinical skills on a manikin rather than a live patient; deleting a requirement that applicants for dental practitioner licensure examinations maintain medical malpractice insurance to cover any incident of harm to a patient during the clinical examination, etc.
Title
Licensure Examinations for Dental Practitioners
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#748 (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Chapter No. 2022-32 | |
2022-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-05 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2022-03-04 | House | CS passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-03 | House | Substituted for CS/CS/HB 517 |
2022-02-28 | House | 1st Reading (Engrossed 1) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022) |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | In Messages |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2022-02-10 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (144414) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/10/22 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2022-02-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time |
2022-01-31 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/03/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | CS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/25/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2022-01-13 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2022-01-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/13/22, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2021-11-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H517 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 926
H997 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S1444 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
H997 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
S1444 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
466 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
466 | 0075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |