FL S0924 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidating and revising provisions relating to obtaining an ad valorem exemption for property owned by an exempt organization, including the requirement that the owner of an exempt organization take affirmative steps to demonstrate an exempt use; authorizing the property appraiser to serve a notice of tax lien on exempt property that is not in actual exempt use after a certain time; providing that the provisions authorizing the tax lien do not apply to a house of public worship, etc.
Title
Property Prepared for a Tax-exempt Use
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Appropriations |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2015-04-08 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 04/07/15, 10:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-17 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/10/15, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0839 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 1955 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 196 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 198 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |