FL S0922 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1265
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exception to the miniature bottle requirement for operators of intrastate railroads and sleeper cars, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale of Alcoholic Beverages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1265
2018-03-07SenateSubstituted CS/HB 1265
2018-03-07SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/18
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-13SenateFavorable by Transportation; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2018-02-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Transportation, 02/13/18, 2:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-23SenateNow in Transportation
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 1
2018-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/24/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/23/18, 11:30 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Transportation; Rules
2017-11-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1265 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Chapter No. 2018-138

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback