FL S0920 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-05 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting local governments adopting technical amendments to the Florida Building Code to implement the National Flood Insurance Program or incentives from denying requests for specified variances or exceptions to certain local floodplain management requirements, etc.
Title
Local Floodplain Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/920 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/920/BillText/Filed/HTML |