FL S0918 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring that court costs for all adoptive parents who adopt children in the custody of the Department of Children and Families be waived, rather than reimbursed, by the department, etc.
Title
Adoption Assistance for Children in the Child Welfare System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H609 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/918 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/918/BillText/Filed/HTML |