FL S0916 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Died in Appropriations Committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements for the sliding fee scale for families receiving school readiness program services to include a new method to calculate parent copayments at the time of eligibility determination and annually thereafter, regardless of the number of children; revising requirements for the data elements that must be collected and reported by the Department of Education; revising the method for determining the annual allocation for the school readiness program; deleting a provision relating to certain expenditures from the Gold Seal Quality Care Program allocation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Readiness Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-17 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-08SenateDied in Appropriations Committee on Education
2024-01-17SenateNow in Appropriations Committee on Education
2024-01-17SenateFavorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2024-01-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 01/17/24, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2024-01-04SenateReferred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
2023-12-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H929 (Same As) 2024-03-08 - Died on Second Reading Calendar
H5101 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Chapter No. 2024-230; companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5001 (Ch. 2024-231)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100284Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100289Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100290Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback