FL S0910 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-61, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that veterans who were discharged or released under any condition, individuals who are current or former United States Department of Defense contractors, and individuals who are current or former military members of a foreign allied country are eligible in a certain Military Veterans and Servicemembers Court Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court-ordered Treatment Programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#23 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#334 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Chapter No. 2019-61, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
2019-06-07 Approved by Governor
2019-06-05 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-05-03SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2019-05-03SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2019-05-03SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (085155)
2019-05-01SenateIn returning messages
2019-05-01HousePassed as amended; YEAS 114 NAYS 0
2019-05-01HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-30HouseAmendment(s) adopted (085155)
2019-04-30HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-29HouseReceived
2019-04-29HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseIn Messages
2019-04-25SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-11SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-08SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/19/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-25SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/04/19, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-02-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1265 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167)
H7125 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-167, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), SB 1136 (Ch. 2019-53), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)
S642 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1021 (Ch. 2019-91), HB 5011 (Ch. 2019-95), CS/HB 7125 (Ch. 2019-167), CS/SB 160 (Ch. 2019-45), CS/SB 828 (Ch. 2019-50), SB 910 (Ch. 2019-61), CS/CS/SB 1418 (Ch. 2019-134)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39447891Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94816Amended CodeSee Bill Text
94821Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback