FL S0908 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a notice of nonpayment to be verified; providing that a provision relating to attorney fees applies to certain suits brought by contractors; requiring a lienor to serve a verified notice of nonpayment to specified entities during a certain period of time; providing that a contractor may record a notice identifying a project bond as a conditional payment bond before project commencement to make the duty of a surety to pay lienors coextensive with the contractor's duty to pay, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction Bonds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Community Affairs
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-30SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2018-01-29SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-01-25SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-25SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2018-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/25/18, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-11-15SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H723 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Careers and Competition Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
25505Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627756Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71323Amended CodeSee Bill Text
713245Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback