FL S0894 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 431
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising legislative intent; defining and redefining terms; revising a limitation on the number of physician assistants a physician may supervise at one time; deleting a requirement that a physician assistant inform his or her patients that they have the right to see a physician before the physician assistant prescribes or dispenses a prescription; authorizing physician assistants to procure drugs and medical devices; revising requirements for a certain formulary; authorizing physician assistants to authenticate documents that may be authenticated by a physician, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician Assistants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 431
2021-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 431
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-22SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-21SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 3
2021-04-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/21, 4:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateNow in Appropriations
2021-04-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/08/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-23SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2021-03-19SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2021-03-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-03-17SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2021-03-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/17/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2021-01-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H431 (Similar To) 2021-04-29 - Message sent to senate
H1299 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
382008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458347Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459022Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Amendment/767294/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Amendment/188076/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Amendment/324598/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Analyses/2021s00894.pre.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Analyses/2021s00894.hp.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Analyses/2021s00894.pre.ahs.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Analyses/2021s00894.ahs.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Analyses/2021s00894.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Analyses/2021s00894-pcs282916.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Analyses/2021s00894.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Vote/2021-03-17%200900AM~S00894%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Vote/2021-04-08%200900AM~S00894%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/894/Vote/2021-04-21%200430PM~S00894%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback