FL S0892 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 225
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a request for a consolidation of multiple charters to be approved or denied within a specified timeframe; requiring a charter school sponsor to provide to the charter school specified information relating to a denial of a request for a consolidation within a certain timeframe; providing for the automatic renewal of a charter under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Charter School Charters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Community Affairs (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 225 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 225 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 5 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Favorable by Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 2 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Referred to Education; Community Affairs; Rules |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H225 (Similar To) 2022-06-01 - Chapter No. 2022-146