FL S0890 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that individuals who hold valid, active local licenses may work within the scope of such licenses in any local government jurisdiction without needing to meet certain additional licensing requirements; requiring licensees to provide consumers with certain information; providing that local governments have disciplinary jurisdiction over such licensees, etc.
Title
Local Licensing
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Now in Community Affairs |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Rules |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1161 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/890 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/890/BillText/Filed/HTML |