FL S0888 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging the Congress to pass H.R. 4184, the ESPERER Act of 2017, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ESPERER Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-14SenateFiled

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback