FL S0882 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain actions taken during a public health emergency or state of emergency from being the basis of determining in civil proceedings whether an individual is an employee or independent contractor or whether an entity is a joint employer, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Determinations of Employment Status

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2021-01-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H579 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
448111Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback