FL S0882 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain restrictive covenants are void and unenforceable for a specified period, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restrictive Covenants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-10SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2019-04-10SenateNow in Judiciary
2019-04-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-08SenateCS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-04-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 04/08/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1243 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
S7078 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 843
H843 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
542335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
542336Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback