FL S0882 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging Congress to preserve the Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals Program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Deferred Action for Childhood Arrivals Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Judiciary
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-16SenateNow in Judiciary
2018-01-16SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2018-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/16/18, 1:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Rules
2017-11-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H475 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback