FL S0876 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the member composition requirements for the Board of Optometry; revising circumstances under which a certified optometrist may administer or prescribe ocular pharmaceutical agents; requiring the board to adopt a negative formulary of ocular pharmaceutical agents certified optometrists are prohibited from administering or prescribing; authorizing certain certified optometrists to perform laser and non-laser ophthalmic procedures and therapies under certain circumstances; requiring the board to determine the required content, grading criteria, and passing score for the licensure examination for certified optometrists; authorizing certified optometrists to remove superficial foreign bodies, etc.
Title
Optometry
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Health Policy (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/10/21, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-03 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/03/21, 12:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H631 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Health & Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
463 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 0135 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
463 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
641 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |