FL S0876 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 539
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising requirements for alarm verification to include additional methods by which an alarm monitoring company may verify a residential or commercial intrusion/burglary alarm signal and to require that two attempts be made to verify an alarm signal, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alarm Verification

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 539
2018-03-06SenateSubstituted CS/HB 539
2018-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/18
2018-02-07SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-07SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/07/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-24SenateNow in Rules
2018-01-23SenateFavorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Community Affairs
2018-01-11SenateCS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-10SenateCS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/10/18, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Regulated Industries; Community Affairs; Rules
2017-11-14SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H539 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - Chapter No. 2018-51

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
489529Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback