FL S0862 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that a lessor of special mobile equipment is not liable for acts of the lessee or the lessee's agent or employee in connection with the rental or lease if the lease agreement requires specified insurance coverages, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance Coverage for Vehicle Leases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateCS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/18/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Rules
2019-02-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H355 (Similar To) 2019-03-15 - Now in Judiciary Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627749Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback