FL S0860 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; Substituted CS/HB 317 -SJ 00742; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 317 (Ch. 2010-51) -SJ 00742
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-22 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; Substituted CS/HB 317 -SJ 00742; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 317 (Ch. 2010-51) -SJ 00742
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the sending of or procuring the sending of letters or inscribed communications containing certain threats of death or bodily injury. Includes electronic communications in such provisions.
Title
Threats [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00742; Substituted CS/HB 317 -SJ 00742; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 317 (Ch. 2010-51) -SJ 00742 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00698 | |
2010-04-16 | Withdrawn from Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00635; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-04-12 | Now in Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00525 | |
2010-04-08 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | |
2010-04-07 | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 -SJ 00524; CS read 1st time on 04/08/10 -SJ 00537 | |
2010-04-01 | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/07/10, 2:00 pm, 37-S | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00062 | |
2010-01-14 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2009-12-07 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0317 (Similar To) 2010-05-11 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-51