FL S0858 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 1013
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the "Sunshine Protection Act"; providing legislative intent regarding the State of Florida and its political subdivisions observing daylight saving time year-round under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Daylight Saving Time

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 1013
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted HB 1013
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/18
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-03-01SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-14SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time
2018-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-12SenateCS/CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Office Building
2018-01-26SenateNow in Commerce and Tourism
2018-01-24SenateCS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2018-01-24SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-23SenateCS by Community Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-18SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/23/18, 3:30 pm, 301 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Community Affairs; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2017-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1013 (Similar To) 2018-03-27 - Chapter No. 2018-99

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback