FL S0854 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 365
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a full-time, part-time, or auxiliary correctional officer to be employed at 18 years of age; prohibiting a correctional officer who is under 19 years of age from supervising inmates, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Officers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 365
2018-03-05SenateSubstituted CS/HB 365
2018-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/18
2018-02-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-22SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/15/18, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/08/18, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-12SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-01-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2018-01-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-01-09SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2018-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/09/18, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H365 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
94313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
944145Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback