FL S0846 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Sheriff of Walton County to provide all child protective investigations in the county beginning with a specified fiscal year, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sheriffs Providing Child Protective Investigative Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Appropriations
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-03-01SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-28SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2018-02-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/28/18, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-11-29SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-11-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1005 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
S1360 (Similar To) 2018-03-07 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1079

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
393065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback