FL S0834 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing a local law enforcement agency to activate the emergency alert system and issue a Lockdown Alert to public and private schools and child care facilities under certain circumstances; requiring local law enforcement agencies to create and maintain a list of all public schools, private schools, and child care facilities within their jurisdictions which must be included in the Lockdown Alert; providing immunity from civil liability to certain persons for damages for complying in good faith with specified provisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Alerts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-01-16SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-01-15SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateCS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-11-07SenateFiled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
784072Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback