FL S0832 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extending the corporate limits of the town to include portions of Edgewater Park and adjoining canals, etc.
Title
Town of Lake Clarke Shores, Palm Beach County
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H973 (Same As) 2021-04-30 - Died in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/832 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/832/BillText/Filed/HTML |