FL S0826 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting vessels under a specified weight from remaining in certain marinas that have been deemed unsuitable for refuge during a hurricane after the issuance of a hurricane watch; requiring a marina owner, operator, employee, or agent to remove specified vessels under certain circumstances; providing that such owner, operator, employee, or agent may charge the vessel owner a reasonable fee for such removal and may not be held liable for any damages as a result of such removal, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marina Evacuations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#9 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenateCS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time
2020-02-19SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-19SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-17SenateCS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/17/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-06SenateNow in Infrastructure and Security
2020-02-04SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
2020-02-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-03SenateCS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-11-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1329 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32759Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback