FL S0824 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Preempting the regulation of vacation rentals to the state; requiring each person applying for a vacation rental license to provide the Division of Hotels and Restaurants of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation with specified information, etc.
Title
Private Property Rights of Homeowners
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S812 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H987 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
H987 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
509 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
509 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |